CO HB1197 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning restrictions on making public the personal information of government employees whose official duties involve child abuse and neglect cases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protect Social Workers' Personal Information On Internet

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1197 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.006 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-07 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1197, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1197, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-11 Governor Signed
2019-04-01 Sent to the Governor
2019-04-01SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-03-29HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-03-26SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-25SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-20SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-03-13SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
2019-03-12HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-11HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-03-07HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-02-20HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1197
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1197_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1197_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1197_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1197_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1197_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1197_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/95d74765827fb051872583b6007f62f9-hb19-1197-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1197vote549d42
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/95d74765827fb051872583b6007f62f9-hb19-1197-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/95d74765827fb051872583b6007f62f9-hb19-1197-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ca80b17a7100d41c872583c3006b9412-hb19-1197-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1197vote55bda2

Bill Comments

feedback