CO HB1197 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-02 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-02 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning authorizing local education providers to operate student-centered accountability system pilot programs, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Student-centered Pilot Accountability Systems
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 18-1197 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 18-1197 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1197, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1197, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 18-1197, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-04-23 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 18-1197, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 18-1197 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1197, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1197, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 18-1197, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-04-23 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 18-1197, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2018-04-27 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-26 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-04-25 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-23 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2018-02-05 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |