CO HB1197 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the exclusion of marijuana from the definition of 'farm products' with regard to regulation of farm products under the 'Farm Products Act'.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exclude Marijuana From Farm Products Definition

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-06 Governor Signed
2017-04-04 Sent to the Governor
2017-04-04SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2017-04-04HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2017-03-28SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2017-03-27SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2017-03-23SenateSenate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2017-03-10SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy
2017-03-10HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2017-03-09HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2017-03-06HouseHouse Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2017-02-22HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb17-1197
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_1197_01.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_1197_eng.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_1197_ren.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_1197_rev.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_1197_rer.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_1197_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hagr2017a2017-03-06t133053z-hb17-1197-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/2017%2520House%2520Journal.pdf#471
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sagr2017a2017-03-23t133222z-hb17-1197-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hagr2017a2017-03-06t133053z-hb17-1197-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/2017%2520Senate%2520Journal.pdf#557

Bill Comments

feedback