CO HB1196 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning changes to the training requirements for applicants for licensure under the 'Barber and Cosmetologist Act'.
Title
Credit Hours Required For Barbers Cosmetologists
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 17-1196 to the Committee of the Whole, with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer House Bill 17-1196, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer House Bill 17-1196, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 17-1196 to the Committee of the Whole, with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer House Bill 17-1196, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer House Bill 17-1196, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | Governor Signed | |
2017-04-04 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |
2017-03-15 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-14 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-03-09 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-02-22 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor |