CO HB1195 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-4)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-4)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the operation of automated pharmacy dispensing systems.
Title
Automated Pharmacy Dispensing System
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-13 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 59 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 23-1195 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.011 (Attachment D). (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 23-1195 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 58 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 23-1195, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment G). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment F). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment E). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 23-1195 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.011 (Attachment D). (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 23-1195 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 58 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 23-1195, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment G). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment F). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment E). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | Governor Signed | |
2023-04-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-04-25 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2023-04-13 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2023-04-06 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2023-04-05 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2023-04-04 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2023-04-03 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2023-04-01 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2023-03-31 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2023-03-30 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2023-03-03 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-03-02 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2023-02-28 | House | House Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2023-02-13 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance |