CO HB1195 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-29 - Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Home Modification Services In Medicaid Waivers

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Home Modification Services In Medicaid Waivers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1195 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 16-1195 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1195 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 16-1195 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1195 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1195 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1195, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1195, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1195, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1195, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-29SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
2016-04-27SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2016-04-18SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
2016-04-18HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2016-04-15HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2016-04-15HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2016-02-25HouseHouse Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Amended to Appropriations
2016-02-03HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/30F47F7FAFB5247087257F2400643A51?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/30F47F7FAFB5247087257F2400643A51/$FILE/1195_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/30F47F7FAFB5247087257F2400643A51/$FILE/1195hie_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/30F47F7FAFB5247087257F2400643A51/$FILE/1195app.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/30F47F7FAFB5247087257F2400643A51/$FILE/1195_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/30F47F7FAFB5247087257F2400643A51/$FILE/1195_ren.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/E5C8BB67E10F72F887257F6400751471
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/E5C8BB67E10F72F887257F6400751471
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/E47C8ED604D4F46887257F640074AF6F
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/E47C8ED604D4F46887257F640074AF6F
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/CA65A76FBDF495A387257F96004BDD64
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/0E4326CE0B76740087257F96004BD6D2
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/csljournals.nsf/(jouhse)/8BC29AF47CC1496587257F99005A63C6/$FILE/Ap18.pdf#894
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/8AB5E2931E36A21A87257FA200620090
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/0FD46531DF56CA0187257FA4004EB207
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/A1B212DCF81ECEE787257FA4004EA594
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/8AB5E2931E36A21A87257FA200620090
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/CA65A76FBDF495A387257F96004BDD64
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/0E4326CE0B76740087257F96004BD6D2
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/0FD46531DF56CA0187257FA4004EB207
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/A1B212DCF81ECEE787257FA4004EA594

Bill Comments

feedback