CO HB1194 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 8 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-08 - House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning creation of the immigration legal defense fund, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Immigration Legal Defense Fund

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 41 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 41 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1194 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 21-1194, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 21-1194, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1194, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1194, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 21-1194, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-08SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2021-06-04SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2021-06-03SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-06-02SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2021-06-02SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2021-05-20SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations
2021-05-12SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
2021-05-12HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-11HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2021-05-07HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-03-30HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations
2021-03-04HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb21-1194
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1194_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1194_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1194_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1194_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1194_rer.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1194_L.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1194_L.002.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1194_J.002.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1194_L.003.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1194_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1194_r1.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1194_hse.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1194_sen.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/5cfec7cf5cfbd251872586a8006baaa9-hb21-1194-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/fd481c9644258f90872586ce005430fb-hb21-1194-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/fd481c9644258f90872586ce005430fb-hb21-1194-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/fd481c9644258f90872586ce005430fb-hb21-1194-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1194vote544264
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/41b243cb386792b9872586db00776951-hb21-1194-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2d551336e804a45f872586e8004d6edf-hb21-1194-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1194vote552aeb
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/41b243cb386792b9872586db00776951-hb21-1194-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1194vote58d0a6
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1194vote58e2ee

Bill Comments 750

feedback