CO HB1194 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the discipline of preschool through second grade students enrolled in publicly funded education programs.
Title
School Discipline For Preschool Through Second Grade
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 19-1194 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 43 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-14 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-14 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 19-1194, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.007 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-14 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 19-1194, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 19-1194 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 43 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-14 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-14 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 19-1194, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.007 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-14 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 19-1194, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-02 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-05-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |
2019-03-20 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-03-19 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2019-03-14 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-02-20 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |