CO HB1194 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning technical changes relating to the operation of pathways in technology early college high schools.
Title
Technical Changes For P-tech Schools
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Foote [D] | Sen. John Cooke [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 17-1194 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 17-1194 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 17-1194 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 17-1194 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | Governor Signed | |
2017-04-07 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-06 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |
2017-03-07 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-06 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-01 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-02-21 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |