CO HB1194 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on April 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-29 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorize General Fund Dollars For LARC Services

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorize General Fund Dollars For LARC Services

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-29SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
2015-04-20SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
2015-04-20HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-04-17HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2015-04-10HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over to 04/20/2015 - No Amendments
2015-04-06HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over to 04/10/2015 - No Amendments
2015-04-02HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2015-02-24HouseHouse Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2015-01-30HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/1FE10B17E0A10A3987257D94006A7721?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/1FE10B17E0A10A3987257D94006A7721/$FILE/1194_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/1FE10B17E0A10A3987257D94006A7721/$FILE/1194_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/1FE10B17E0A10A3987257D94006A7721/$FILE/1194_ren.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/B4CAE0A09EDACDA187257DF70008CE31
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/9EE295D6D1E9A39187257E1B00518E93
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/F91DB30A0D7A6DEB87257E360082709C
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/911F62616473B84087257E360082661D

Bill Comments

feedback