CO HB1192 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the inclusion of matters relating to American minorities in the teaching of social contributions in civil government in public schools, and, in connection therewith, establishing the history, culture, social contributions, and civil government in education commission to make recommendations to include the history, culture, and social contributions of American Indians, Latinos, African Americans, and Asian Americans, the lesbian, gay, bisexual, and transgender individuals within these minority groups, the contributions and persecution of religious minorities, and the intersectionality of significant social and cultural features within these communities, in the teaching and content standards for history and civics, and making an appropriation.
Title
Inclusion Of American Minorities In Teaching Civil Government
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1192 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 19-1192 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.005) (Y: 23 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-15 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.010) (Y: 24 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-15 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-15 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1192, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 19-1192, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 19-1192, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1192 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 19-1192 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.005) (Y: 23 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-15 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.010) (Y: 24 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-15 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-15 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1192, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 19-1192, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 19-1192, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-05-15 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-27 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |
2019-03-18 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-03-15 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2019-03-15 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-03-05 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2019-02-20 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |