CO HB1192 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the Colorado food systems advisory council, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Colorado Food Systems Advisory Council
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 17-1192 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 17-1192 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-28 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-28 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1192, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 17-1192, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 17-1192, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 17-1192 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-28 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-28 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1192, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 17-1192, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 17-1192, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2017-05-01 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-28 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-04-28 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-06 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2017-02-17 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources |