CO HB1190 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-06 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-06 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a right of first refusal to purchase qualifying multifamily residential property by a local government.
Title
Affordable Housing Right Of First Refusal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 41 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 42 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.081) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.080) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Local Government & Housing: Refer House Bill 23-1190, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Local Government & Housing: Refer House Bill 23-1190, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Local Government & Housing: Adopt amendment L.043 (Attachment F). (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Local Government & Housing: Adopt amendment L.041 (Attachment I). (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Local Government & Housing: Adopt amendment L.033 (Attachment H). (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Local Government & Housing: Adopt amendment L.032 (Attachment G). (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Local Government & Housing: Adopt amendment L.030 (Attachment E). (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Local Government & Housing: Adopt amendment L.042 (Attachment D). (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 43 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Refer House Bill 23-1190, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.012 (Attachment L). (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.011 (Attachment K). (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment M). (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment J). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment I). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment H). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment G). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 42 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.081) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.080) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Local Government & Housing: Refer House Bill 23-1190, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Local Government & Housing: Refer House Bill 23-1190, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Local Government & Housing: Adopt amendment L.043 (Attachment F). (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Local Government & Housing: Adopt amendment L.041 (Attachment I). (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Local Government & Housing: Adopt amendment L.033 (Attachment H). (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Local Government & Housing: Adopt amendment L.032 (Attachment G). (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Local Government & Housing: Adopt amendment L.030 (Attachment E). (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Local Government & Housing: Adopt amendment L.042 (Attachment D). (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 43 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Refer House Bill 23-1190, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.012 (Attachment L). (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.011 (Attachment K). (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment M). (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment J). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment I). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment H). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment G). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-06 | Governor Vetoed | |
2023-05-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-05-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2023-05-08 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2023-05-07 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2023-05-06 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 05/01/2023 - No Amendments |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/24/2023 - No Amendments |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/17/2023 - No Amendments |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Senate Committee on Local Government & Housing Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government & Housing |
2023-03-07 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-03-06 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2023-03-03 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2023-02-28 | House | House Committee on Transportation, Housing & Local Government Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2023-02-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation, Housing & Local Government |