CO HB1189 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning pilot programs to expand effective teacher residency programs across the state, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Expanding Effective Teacher Residency Programs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-04 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 46 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1189, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 18-1189, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 53 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-11 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1189, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1189, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 18-1189, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 18-1189, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1189, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 18-1189, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 53 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-11 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1189, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1189, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 18-1189, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 18-1189, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-30 | Governor Signed | |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-05-14 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-05-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-05-04 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2018-05-02 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |
2018-04-17 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-16 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-04-13 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over to 04/16/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-04-12 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-04-11 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-02-26 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2018-02-02 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |