CO HB1187 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning alternatives in the criminal justice system for pregnant persons.
Title
Alternatives In Criminal Justice System And Pregnant Persons
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-26 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 46 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 47 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 23-1187, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.026 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 23-1187, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.020 (Attachment B) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 23-1187, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 47 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 23-1187, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.026 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 23-1187, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.020 (Attachment B) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 23-1187, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-23 | Governor Signed | |
2023-05-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-05-22 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2023-04-26 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2023-04-25 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2023-03-03 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-03-02 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2023-02-27 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2023-02-22 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2023-02-08 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |