CO HB1187 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-04 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the lawful use of a prescription drug that contains cannabidiol that is approved by the United States food and drug administration.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Food And Drug Administration Cannabidiol Drug Use

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 18-1187 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment E) to amendment L.002 (Attachment C). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-20 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment C), as amended. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-20 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 18-1187, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 18-1187, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-04 Governor Signed
2018-05-01 Sent to the Governor
2018-05-01SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2018-05-01HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2018-04-24SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-04-23SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-04-18SenateSenate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2018-04-05SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
2018-04-05HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-04-04HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2018-04-02HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over to 04/04/2018 - No Amendments
2018-03-29HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over to 04/02/2018 - No Amendments
2018-03-28HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over to 03/29/2018 - No Amendments
2018-03-27HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over to 03/28/2018 - No Amendments
2018-03-26HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over to 03/27/2018 - No Amendments
2018-03-23HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over to 03/26/2018 - No Amendments
2018-03-20HouseHouse Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2018-02-02HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb18-1187
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1187_01.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1187_eng.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1187_ren.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1187_rev.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1187_rer.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1187_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hphc2018a2018-03-20t133156z-hb18-1187-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hphc2018a2018-03-20t133156z-hb18-1187-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hphc2018a2018-03-20t133156z-hb18-1187-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hphc2018a2018-03-20t133156z-hb18-1187-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb18-1187vote5cd2c1
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sblt2018a2018-04-18t140649z-hb18-1187-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb18-1187vote56c429

Bill Comments

feedback