CO HB1187 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-24 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-24 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Northeastern Jr College Club Employees
Title
Northeastern Jr College Club Employees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1187 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1187 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1187 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1187, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1187, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1187, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1187 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1187 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1187, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1187, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1187, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-24 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2011-03-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-03-18 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-03-17 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2011-03-15 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2011-03-14 | Senate Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-09 | Senate Committee on Business, Labor and Technology Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2011-02-21 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor and Technology | |
2011-02-15 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-02-14 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments | |
2011-02-10 | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2011-02-03 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |