CO HB1186 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning relieving the regional transportation district of statutory restrictions related to the district's operations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regional Transportation District Operation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 21-1186 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 38 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 21-1186, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 21-1186, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-24 Governor Signed
2021-05-14 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-14SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-05-14HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2021-05-03SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-04-30SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-04-27SenateSenate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2021-04-09SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy
2021-04-06HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-04-05HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2021-03-30HouseHouse Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-03-04HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb21-1186
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1186_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1186_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1186_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1186_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1186_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1186_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1186_L.001.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1186_00.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f940eaec8802fdb5872586a8006bb7e4-hb21-1186-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1186vote54dedd
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f940eaec8802fdb5872586a8006bb7e4-hb21-1186-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/999d6288608fe693872586c4006e9391-hb21-1186-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1186vote5bcbfc

Bill Comments 750

feedback