CO HB1186 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning fingerprinting options for background checks for school employees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School Employment Background Check Clarification

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 19-1186 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 19-1186, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 19-1186, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-10 Governor Signed
2019-04-01 Sent to the Governor
2019-04-01SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-03-29HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-03-26SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-25SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-20SenateSenate Committee on Education Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-03-13SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Education
2019-03-11HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-08HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2019-03-07HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-03-06HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-02-26HouseHouse Committee on Education Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-02-15HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Education

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1186
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1186_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1186_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1186_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1186_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1186_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1186_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/4304f7b84c14b857872583ad0072d6fe-hb19-1186-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/4304f7b84c14b857872583ad0072d6fe-hb19-1186-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1186vote5ac5bd
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/68fefb0b6a8761c4872583c3005ad339-hb19-1186-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1186vote55bd99

Bill Comments

feedback