CO HB1185 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the establishment of a new state holiday in place of Columbus day.
Title
Replace Columbus Day With New State Holiday
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 19-1185 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 19-1185 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 37 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.006) (Y: 14 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-28 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.004) (Y: 5 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-28 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (c.001) (Y: 23 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-21 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 19-1185 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 19-1185 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 37 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.006) (Y: 14 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-28 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.004) (Y: 5 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-28 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (c.001) (Y: 23 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-21 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 19-1185 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2019-03-04 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-03-01 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-02-28 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-02-26 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 02/28/2019 - No Amendments |
2019-02-21 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-02-15 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |