CO HB1184 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a requirement that staff of the legislative council prepare demographic notes on certain legislative bills, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Demographic Notes For Certain Legislative Bills
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1184 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Joint - Legislative Council: Refer House Bill 19-1184 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-12 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1184, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Finance: Amend L.003, line 13, strike "AND GEOGRAPHY" and substitute "GEOGRAPHY, OR ANY OTHER RELEVANT CHARACTERISTIC FOR WHICH DATA ARE READILY AVAILABLE.". (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-04 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-04 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1184, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1184, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1184 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Joint - Legislative Council: Refer House Bill 19-1184 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-12 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1184, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Finance: Amend L.003, line 13, strike "AND GEOGRAPHY" and substitute "GEOGRAPHY, OR ANY OTHER RELEVANT CHARACTERISTIC FOR WHICH DATA ARE READILY AVAILABLE.". (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-04 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-04 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1184, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1184, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-05-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-27 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate Committee on Legislative Council Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Legislative Council |
2019-04-16 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-15 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-12 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-04-12 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-03-04 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2019-02-15 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |