CO HB1184 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the creation of a report on 911 service in Colorado, and, in connection therewith, requiring consideration of issues related to the implementation of next generation 911.
Title
Create Next Generation 911 Board
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1184 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-20 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1184 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2018-03-27 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2018-03-27 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer House Bill 18-1184, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1184 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-20 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1184 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2018-03-27 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2018-03-27 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer House Bill 18-1184, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-29 | Governor Signed | |
2018-05-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-05-15 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2018-04-20 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-19 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-04-19 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-03-27 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2018-03-13 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only |
2018-02-02 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor |