CO HB1183 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the continuation of the regulation of home food service plans pursuant to the "Sale of Meat Act", and, in connection therewith, implementing the department of regulatory agencies' sunset review recommendation to repeal the act.
Title
Sunset Repeal Dept Agriculture Regulation Home Sale Of Meat
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Refer House Bill 18-1183 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 18-1183 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Refer House Bill 18-1183 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 18-1183 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | Governor Signed | |
2018-03-15 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-03-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy |
2018-02-21 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-02-20 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 02/21/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-02-16 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-02-13 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-02-02 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |