CO HB1182 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-04 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-04 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public Ed Accountability 2015-16 School Year
Title
Public Ed Accountability 2015-16 School Year
Sponsors
Rep. Millie Hamner [D] | Sen. Andy Kerr [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1182 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1182 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1182, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1182, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1182 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1182, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1182, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-04 | House | Governor Signed |
2014-03-26 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-03-26 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-25 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-03-20 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |
2014-03-04 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-03-03 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2014-02-26 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-01-29 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |