CO HB1181 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning requiring a single statewide end-of-year assessment for students enrolled in ninth grade that is aligned with the tenth-grade state assessment, and, in connection therewith, reducing an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Required State Assessment For Ninth-grade Students

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1181 to the Committee of the Whole. Add to consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 17-1181 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-03 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1181, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 17-1181 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-06 Governor Signed
2017-05-02 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-01SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2017-05-01HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2017-04-17SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2017-04-13SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2017-04-11SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2017-03-23SenateSenate Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2017-03-10SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Education
2017-03-09HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2017-03-08HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2017-03-07HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2017-03-03HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2017-02-13HouseHouse Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2017-02-10HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Education

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb17-1181
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_1181_01.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_1181_eng.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_1181_ren.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_1181_rev.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_1181_rer.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_1181_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hed2017a2017-02-13t133903z-hb17-1181-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/happ2017a2017-03-03t075755z-hb17-1181-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/happ2017a2017-03-03t075755z-hb17-1181-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/2017%2520House%2520Journal.pdf#459
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sed2017a2017-03-23t133235z-hb17-1181-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sapp2017a2017-04-11t084127z-hb17-1181-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/2017%2520Senate%2520Journal.pdf#807

Bill Comments

feedback