CO HB1175 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on March 23 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-23 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning modifications to certain tax statutes in order to address defects and anachronisms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modify Certain Tax Statutes To Address Defects

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 20-1175 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1175 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1175 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-23 Sent to the Governor
2020-03-17HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2020-03-17SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-10SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-03-09SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-03-04SenateSenate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-02-24SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
2020-02-21HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-20HouseHouse Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-19HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2020-02-14HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-02-06HouseHouse Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2020-01-28HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs + Appropriations

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb20-1175
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1175_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1175_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1175_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1175_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1175_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1175_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d78f406a608c8ee08725850600741c06-hb20-1175-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/0dd8964b64cfc89c8725850e005416e0-hb20-1175-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1175vote5adfa0
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/43751b3d7ecbbc6a872585210071d9c7-hb20-1175-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1175vote5bba3f

Bill Comments

feedback