CO HB1175 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Senate Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Senate Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the continuation under the sunset law of the regulation of community association managers by the director of the division of real estate, and, in connection therewith, implementing the recommendations contained in the 2017 sunset report of the department of regulatory agencies.
Title
Sunset Community Association Managers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-10 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.005 [Attachment B]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1175, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Senate Finance: Postpone House Bill 18-1175 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 38 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-16 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1175 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1175 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer House Bill 18-1175 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1175, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Senate Finance: Postpone House Bill 18-1175 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 38 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-16 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1175 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1175 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer House Bill 18-1175 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2018-03-23 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-22 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-21 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 03/22/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-03-20 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 03/21/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-03-16 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-02-28 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2018-02-13 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Unamended to Finance |
2018-02-02 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor |