CO HB1175 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Endorsement Competency Cont Education
Title
Endorsement Competency Cont Education
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 10-1175 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 10-1175, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 10-1175, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-29 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2010-03-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-03-18 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-03-15 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2010-03-09 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2010-03-08 | Senate Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-05 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-03-01 | Senate Committee on Business, Labor and Technology Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2010-02-17 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor and Technology | |
2010-02-09 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2010-02-08 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-02-03 | House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2010-01-22 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor |