CO HB1175 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a local government right of first refusal or offer to purchase qualifying multifamily property for the purpose of providing long-term affordable housing or mixed-income development.
Title
Local Goverments Rights to Property for Affordable Housing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 41 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - Senate - Senate Local Government & Housing: Refer House Bill 24-1175, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - Senate - Senate Local Government & Housing: Adopt amendment L.018 (Attachment A). (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 38 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Refer House Bill 24-1175, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.006 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.007 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 41 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - Senate - Senate Local Government & Housing: Refer House Bill 24-1175, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - Senate - Senate Local Government & Housing: Adopt amendment L.018 (Attachment A). (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 38 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Refer House Bill 24-1175, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.006 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.007 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-30 | Governor Signed | |
2024-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-05-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2024-05-08 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2024-05-04 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 05/07/2024 - No Amendments |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 05/04/2024 - No Amendments |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 05/03/2024 - No Amendments |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 05/02/2024 - No Amendments |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 05/01/2024 - No Amendments |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/30/2024 - No Amendments |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on Local Government & Housing Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government & Housing |
2024-04-08 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-05 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2024-04-03 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2024-03-22 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2024-02-23 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2024-02-20 | House | House Committee on Transportation, Housing & Local Government Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-01-31 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation, Housing & Local Government |