CO HB1173 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on May 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-26 - Senate Committee on Transportation & Energy Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning excavation notification requirements for underground facility location in connection with county road maintenance, and, in connection therewith, specifying that excavation does not include routine or emergency maintenance of right-of-way on county-owned gravel or dirt roads that does not lower the existing grade or elevation of the road, shoulder, and ditches and that does not disturb more than six inches in depth during maintenance operations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

811 Locate Exemption For County Road Maintenance

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Postpone House Bill 20-1173 indefinitely. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 20-1173, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 20-1173, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-26SenateSenate Committee on Transportation & Energy Postpone Indefinitely
2020-03-03SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy
2020-03-02HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-28HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2020-02-18HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2020-02-12HouseHouse Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-01-28HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government

Subjects


Colorado State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback