CO HB1173 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-13 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-13 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Winter Driving I-70 Tread Depth & Tire Chains
Title
Winter Driving I-70 Tread Depth & Tire Chains
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt draft conference committee report CLHB 1173.001 (Attachment C) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1173, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1173, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1173, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1173, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-13 | House | Governor Signed |
2015-05-01 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-01 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-05-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2015-04-22 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2015-04-22 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2015-04-22 | House | House Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Recede - CCR not produced |
2015-04-21 | House | First Conference Committee Result was to No Report |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/10/2015 - No Amendments |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Transportation Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation |
2015-03-06 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-02-27 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 03/06/2015 - No Amendments |
2015-02-26 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2015-02-23 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 02/26/2015 - No Amendments |
2015-02-18 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |