CO HB1171 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-10 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Repeal Of School Reporting Requirements

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repeal Of School Reporting Requirements

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2010-06-10 Governor Action - Signed
2010-05-24 Sent to the Governor
2010-05-24 Signed by the President of the Senate
2010-05-20 Signed by the Speaker of the House
2010-04-28 House Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass
2010-04-27 Senate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass
2010-04-16 First Conference Committee Result was to Adopt Rerevised w/ Amendments
2010-04-01 House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee
2010-03-31 Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments
2010-03-30 Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily
2010-03-29 Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2010-03-23 Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
2010-03-10 Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2010-02-19 Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education
2010-02-18 House Third Reading Passed
2010-02-17 House Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2010-02-12 House Second Reading Laid Over to 02/17/2010
2010-02-08 House Committee on Education Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2010-01-22 Introduced In House - Assigned to Education

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/42E285F47258D0C6872576AC0055EA3A?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/42E285F47258D0C6872576AC0055EA3A/$FILE/1171_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/42E285F47258D0C6872576AC0055EA3A/$FILE/1171sedu_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/42E285F47258D0C6872576AC0055EA3A/$FILE/1171_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/42E285F47258D0C6872576AC0055EA3A/$FILE/1171_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/42E285F47258D0C6872576AC0055EA3A/$FILE/1171_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/42E285F47258D0C6872576AC0055EA3A/$FILE/1171_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/42E285F47258D0C6872576AC0055EA3A/$FILE/1171_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2010A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/EEC645BC0AAA3EBB872576C4007FDCCE
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2010A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/5B4034DAF6CBC405872576E2006B4502
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2010A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/F794EB857C262CCE872577070066BFCD

Bill Comments

feedback