CO HB1168 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning permitting public schools to provide a hunter education course to seventh grade students.
Title
Public School Hunter Education Seventh Grade Course
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 59 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 47 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 22-1168, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Adopt amendment L.008 (Y: 1 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Adopt amendment L.007 (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Adopt amendment L.006 (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 22-1168, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 57 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Refer House Bill 22-1168, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Refer House Bill 22-1168, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 47 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 22-1168, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Adopt amendment L.008 (Y: 1 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Adopt amendment L.007 (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Adopt amendment L.006 (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 22-1168, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 57 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Refer House Bill 22-1168, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Refer House Bill 22-1168, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | Governor Signed | |
2022-04-19 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-04-18 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-03-31 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2022-03-30 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources |
2022-03-03 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-03-02 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2022-02-24 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Water Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-02-04 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Water |