CO HB1168 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-14 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-14 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sunset Rural Alcohol & Sub Abuse Treatment Prog
Title
Sunset Rural Alcohol & Sub Abuse Treatment Prog
Sponsors
Sen. Joann Ginal [D] | Sen. Ray Scott [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1168 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1168 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1168 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1168 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1168 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1168 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1168 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1168 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-14 | House | Governor Signed |
2016-04-05 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-04-04 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-03-30 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2016-03-01 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-02-29 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-02-23 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2016-02-01 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |