CO HB1168 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Limit Reimburs Fully Comp Injured Person
Title
Limit Reimburs Fully Comp Injured Person
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 10-1168, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 10-1168, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation. Members of the committee commented about their positions on the bill (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 10-1168, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation. Members of the committee commented about their positions on the bill (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2010-04-19 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-04-19 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-04-16 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2010-04-01 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | |
2010-03-30 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Lay Over Daily | |
2010-03-29 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2010-03-26 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-25 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-03-22 | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2010-03-11 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary | |
2010-03-08 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2010-03-05 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-02 | House Second Reading Laid Over to 03/05/2010 | |
2010-02-25 | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2010-02-22 | House Committee on Judiciary Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only | |
2010-01-22 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |