CO HB1167 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning an authorization for notaries public to perform notarial acts using audio-video communication.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Remote Notaries Protect Privacy

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1167 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.020 (Y: 4 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1167, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1167, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1167, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1167, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 49 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.007) (Y: 17 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-04-02 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.016) (Y: 16 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-27 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1167 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1167, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1167, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment G). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-14 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment H). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-14 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 19-1167, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 19-1167, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-30SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-29SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-26SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-04-25SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2019-04-17SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Finance
2019-04-08SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
2019-04-03HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-02HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2019-04-01HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-03-27HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-03-04HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2019-02-14HouseHouse Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Finance
2019-01-30HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1167
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1167_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1167_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1167_ren.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/5d96eaada86aee23872583a1007810ff-hb19-1167-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/5d96eaada86aee23872583a1007810ff-hb19-1167-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/5d96eaada86aee23872583a1007810ff-hb19-1167-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/5d96eaada86aee23872583a1007810ff-hb19-1167-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d2ae9b0c11435f26872583b300824705-hb19-1167-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d2ae9b0c11435f26872583b300824705-hb19-1167-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2424cd40212a2d7d872583ca004b5d20-hb19-1167-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1167vote61e5d0
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1167vote616864
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1167vote548753
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/341e3943ee606124872583df006e52fa-hb19-1167-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/341e3943ee606124872583df006e52fa-hb19-1167-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/9b0ffb8afe320d49872583e700710f93-hb19-1167-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/b6ef38972633813e872583e90008a352-hb19-1167-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/b6ef38972633813e872583e90008a352-hb19-1167-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/9b0ffb8afe320d49872583e700710f93-hb19-1167-1-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback