CO HB1165 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 23 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-23 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning modifications to the interior design exemption set forth in the laws governing the practice of architecture.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Interior Design Practice

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 20-1165 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-18 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 20-1165, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-23 Sent to the Governor
2020-03-14SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-03-13SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2020-03-11SenateSenate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-02-28SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
2020-02-27HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-24HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2020-02-21HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2020-02-18HouseHouse Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-01-28HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb20-1165
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1165_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1165_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1165_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1165_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1165_rer.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/5354573241dc8869872585120061bffd-hb20-1165-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/5354573241dc8869872585120061bffd-hb20-1165-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1165vote5a5e71
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/3d0e8382be3def8e87258528006dbe14-hb20-1165-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1165vote54a901

Bill Comments

feedback