CO HB1164 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-28 - House Second Reading Laid Over to 12/31/2020 - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the exemption of a housing authority from certain fees imposed by a water conservancy district.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Housing Authority Exemptions From Water Fees

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-28HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over to 12/31/2020 - No Amendments
2020-02-18HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2020-02-12HouseHouse Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-01-23HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government

Subjects


Colorado State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback