CO HB1164 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Nonpartisan Elections Not Coordinated Cnty Clerks
Title
Nonpartisan Elections Not Coordinated Cnty Clerks
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1164, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.020 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.018 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.016 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.020 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.018 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.016 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1164, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1164, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment J) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-01-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-01-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-01-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment G) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-01-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-01-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment J) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-01-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-01-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-01-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment G) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-01-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-01-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1164, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.020 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.018 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.016 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.020 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.018 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.016 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1164, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1164, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment J) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-01-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-01-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-01-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment G) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-01-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-01-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment J) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-01-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-01-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-01-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment G) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-01-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-01-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1164, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-18 | House | Governor Signed |
2014-02-17 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-02-17 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-02-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-02-17 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-02-13 | House | Senate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2014-01-30 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-01-29 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2014-01-27 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-01-21 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |