CO HB1162 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the management of plastic products.
Title
Management Of Plastic Products
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 41 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 44 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 17 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1162, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1162, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1162, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.040) (Y: 23 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-05-04 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.039) (Y: 27 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-05-04 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.038) (Y: 26 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-05-04 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.037) (Y: 27 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-05-04 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.036) (Y: 24 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-05-04 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.029) (Y: 28 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-05-04 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.028) (Y: 26 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1162, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 4 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1162, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.015 (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1162, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 21-1162, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House Energy & Environment: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment E). (Y: 5 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-11 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 21-1162, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 44 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 17 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1162, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1162, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1162, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.040) (Y: 23 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-05-04 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.039) (Y: 27 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-05-04 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.038) (Y: 26 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-05-04 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.037) (Y: 27 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-05-04 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.036) (Y: 24 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-05-04 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.029) (Y: 28 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-05-04 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.028) (Y: 26 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1162, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 4 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1162, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.015 (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1162, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 21-1162, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House Energy & Environment: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment E). (Y: 5 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-11 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 21-1162, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-06 | Governor Signed | |
2021-06-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-06-22 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-06-08 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2021-06-03 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2021-05-05 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-04 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-05-04 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-29 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2021-03-11 | House | House Committee on Energy & Environment Refer Amended to Finance |
2021-03-03 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Energy & Environment + Finance |