CO HB1160 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-01 - House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning measures to reduce health care costs related to prescription drug prices, and, in connection therewith, creating the "Colorado Prescription Drug Price Transparency Act of 2020" to require health insurers, prescription drug manufacturers, pharmacy benefit management firms, and nonprofit organizations to report specified information about the costs of prescription drugs to the commissioner of insurance and to direct the commissioner to analyze the information and submit a report regarding the effects of prescription drug costs on health insurance premiums; and requiring health insurers to reduce insurance premiums to adjust for rebates the insurers receive for prescription drugs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Drug Price Transparency Insurance Premium Reductions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-13 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1160, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1160, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1160 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.002, as amended (Attachment B). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-12 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment C). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-12 - House - House Health & Insurance: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment G). (Y: 4 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-12 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 20-1160, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 20-1160, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-01HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2020-05-28HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over to 06/01/2020 - No Amendments
2020-03-13HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-03-02HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2020-02-12HouseHouse Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Amended to Finance
2020-01-21HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance + Appropriations

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb20-1160
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1160_01.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/c4d578e0ef68233b8725850c007f2c00-hb20-1160-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/c4d578e0ef68233b8725850c007f2c00-hb20-1160-4-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/c4d578e0ef68233b8725850c007f2c00-hb20-1160-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/c4d578e0ef68233b8725850c007f2c00-hb20-1160-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/c4d578e0ef68233b8725850c007f2c00-hb20-1160-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/390d857de26e45e58725851f0070d4e6-hb20-1160-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/77e8b49f2655bd158725852a004d5294-hb20-1160-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/77e8b49f2655bd158725852a004d5294-hb20-1160-1-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback