CO HB1160 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 13 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning a mental health facility pilot program, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mental Health Facility Pilot Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-03 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Repass (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Adopt (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Conference Committee Report Adopt Ccr (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Conference Committee Report Repass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Joint - CC_HB19-1160_2019A: Adopt conference committee report CLHB 1160.001 (Attachment A). (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House: Senate Amendments Notcncr (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1160 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 19-1160, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 19-1160, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-15 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1160, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1160, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1160, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-13SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-05-13HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-05-03HouseHouse Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass
2019-05-02SenateSenate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass
2019-05-01 First Conference Committee Result was to Adopt Rerevised w/ Amendments
2019-04-29SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee
2019-04-27SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2019-04-26SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2019-04-25SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2019-04-24SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-23SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-04-19SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-04-03SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations
2019-03-25SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
2019-03-20HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-19HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-03-18HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-03-15HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-03-15HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-02-27HouseHouse Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations
2019-01-30HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services + Appropriations

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1160
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1160_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1160_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1160_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1160_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1160_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1160_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ebb5a5bbdf25f76c872583ae00619b92-hb19-1160-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ebb5a5bbdf25f76c872583ae00619b92-hb19-1160-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/41fd40e7439972cd872583be004d89e3-hb19-1160-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/41fd40e7439972cd872583be004d89e3-hb19-1160-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1160vote566938
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1b66df183a17b754872583d1006edb53-hb19-1160-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/5a9d3c70b862213c872583e10055c55e-hb19-1160-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1b66df183a17b754872583d1006edb53-hb19-1160-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1160vote581c69
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1160vote5fd5d6
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1160vote186cab
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1160vote1854c6
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1160vote5bd2cb
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1160vote5beabf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/aae7d2e34acd7ed4872583ed004a77c2-hb19-1160-0-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback