CO HB1160 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-04 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-04 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Divisible Load Overweight Vehicle Permits
Title
Divisible Load Overweight Vehicle Permits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1160 to the Committee of the Whole. Consent Calendar The motion passed on a vote of 7-0. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1160 to the Committee of the Whole. Consent Calendar The motion passed on a vote of 7-0. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1160 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1160 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1160, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1160, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1160 to the Committee of the Whole. Consent Calendar The motion passed on a vote of 7-0. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1160 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1160 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1160, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1160, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-04 | House | Governor Signed |
2014-03-26 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-03-26 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-26 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Transportation Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation |
2014-02-19 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-02-18 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2014-02-17 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-02-12 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-01-17 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |