CO HB1160 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-26 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-26 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Wellness Incentives Rewards Outcomes
Title
Wellness Incentives Rewards Outcomes
Sponsors
Sen. Shawn Mitchell [R] | Rep. Joe Rice [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 10-1160, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 10-1160, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 10-1160, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-26 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2010-05-24 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-05-24 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-05-20 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2010-04-28 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | |
2010-04-27 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily | |
2010-04-23 | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 04/23/2010 | |
2010-04-20 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-19 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-04-14 | Senate Committee on Business, Labor and Technology Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2010-03-31 | Senate Committee on Business, Labor and Technology Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only | |
2010-03-16 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor and Technology | |
2010-03-10 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2010-03-09 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-08 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-02-11 | House Committee on Health and Human Services Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2010-02-08 | House Committee on Health and Human Services Lay Over Amended | |
2010-01-20 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health and Human Services |