CO HB1156 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning modification of reporting requirements affecting the disclosure of information of individuals seeking elected public office, and, in connection therewith, changing a campaign finance reporting deadline and clarifying a personal financial disclosure requirement.
Title
Public Official Reporting Requirements Modification
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Kennedy [D] | Rep. Dave Williams [R] | Sen. Jeff Bridges [D] | Sen. Bob Gardner [R] |
Rep. Monica Duran [D] | Rep. Cathy Kipp [D] | Rep. Susan Lontine [D] | Rep. Marc Snyder [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 22-1156 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 52 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer House Bill 22-1156, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer House Bill 22-1156, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 22-1156 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 52 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer House Bill 22-1156, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer House Bill 22-1156, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-18 | Governor Signed | |
2022-04-14 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-04-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2022-03-03 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-03-02 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2022-03-01 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2022-02-24 | House | House Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-02-04 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs |