CO HB1155 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-1)
Status: Passed on May 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-26 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-1)
Status: Passed on May 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-26 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning in-state tuition classification at institutions of higher education for students who complete high school in Colorado.
Title
In-state Tuition For Colorado High School Graduates
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-28 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 45 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 22-1155 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 22-1155, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 22-1155, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 22-1155 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 22-1155, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 22-1155, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-26 | Governor Signed | |
2022-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-05-25 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-04-28 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |
2022-04-12 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-11 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2022-04-06 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-02-04 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |