CO HB1155 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-24 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-24 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the ability to cure campaign finance reporting deficiencies without penalty.
Title
Cure Campaign Finance Reporting Deficiencies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Conference Committee Report (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House: Adopt Conference Committee Report (Y: 63 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House: Concur in Senate Amendment (Y: 50 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 17-1155 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 17-1155, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 17-1155, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House: Adopt Conference Committee Report (Y: 63 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House: Concur in Senate Amendment (Y: 50 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 17-1155 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 17-1155, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 17-1155, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-24 | Governor Signed | |
2017-05-24 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-05-22 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-05-09 | House | House Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass |
2017-05-02 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee |
2017-05-01 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2017-04-28 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over to 05/01/2017 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2017-04-26 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2017-04-25 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2017-04-24 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2017-04-21 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over to 04/24/2017 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2017-04-19 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2017-04-18 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2017-03-24 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-23 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-03-20 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-03-17 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 03/20/2017 - No Amendments |
2017-03-16 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-03-09 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-02-06 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |