CO HB1151 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 51-14)
Status: Passed on May 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-15 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 51-14)
Status: Passed on May 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-15 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning allowing a federally recognized Indian tribe to certify its own foster homes.
Title
Indian Tribes To Certify Own Foster Homes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer House Bill 21-1151 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 21-1151 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer House Bill 21-1151 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 21-1151 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-15 | Governor Signed | |
2021-05-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government |
2021-03-29 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-03-26 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-03-23 | House | House Committee on Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-03 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services |