CO HB1151 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-11 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-11 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Human Trafficking And Prostitution
Title
Human Trafficking And Prostitution
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.006 (Attachment F). Discussion ensued regarding the amendment (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2012-03-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1151, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.006 (Attachment F). Discussion ensued regarding the amendment (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2012-03-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1151, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared amendment L.001 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared amendment L.003 (Attachment H), as amended (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared amendment L.002 (Attachment G) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared amendment L.004 (Attachment I), which amends L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared amendment L.001 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared amendment L.003 (Attachment H), as amended (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared amendment L.002 (Attachment G) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared amendment L.004 (Attachment I), which amends L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1151, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1151, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1151, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.006 (Attachment F). Discussion ensued regarding the amendment (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2012-03-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1151, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared amendment L.001 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared amendment L.003 (Attachment H), as amended (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared amendment L.002 (Attachment G) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared amendment L.004 (Attachment I), which amends L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared amendment L.001 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared amendment L.003 (Attachment H), as amended (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared amendment L.002 (Attachment G) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared amendment L.004 (Attachment I), which amends L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1151, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1151, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-11 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2012-05-03 | Sent to the Governor | |
2012-04-30 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | |
2012-03-19 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily | |
2012-03-15 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-14 | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2012-03-13 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-12 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary | |
2012-02-22 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2012-02-21 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-02-17 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2012-02-14 | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2012-01-20 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |