CO HB1151 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-30 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-30 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Cruelty To Service Animals
Title
Cruelty To Service Animals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1151, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1151, as to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1151, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1151, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1151, as to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1151, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1151, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-30 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2011-03-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-03-25 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2011-03-25 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-03-21 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | |
2011-03-17 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily | |
2011-03-15 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2011-03-14 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-08 | Senate Committee on Local Government Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2011-03-02 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government | |
2011-02-22 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-02-21 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments | |
2011-02-16 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-02-10 | House Committee on Health and Environment Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2011-01-27 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health and Environment |